Trustees Bath City FC Foundation

Charity number: 1143224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Alan Lindsay Mullen Chair 25 January 2021
None on record
Daniel Smith Trustee 26 March 2025
None on record
Sarah Jane Williment Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record
Matthew Rusling Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
Kate Lowri Abbey Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Andrew Mark Iles Trustee 19 December 2018
None on record
DAVID MARCUS CAVALIERO Trustee 21 March 2018
THE CAVALIERO FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST CIO
Received: On time
Lee Williams Trustee 21 March 2018
BROAD PLAIN - WORKING WITH YOUNG PEOPLE
Received: On time
THE GROVE AT BEDMINSTER DOWN
Received: On time
ASHTON VALE CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Received: On time
SEA MILLS BOYS' & GIRLS' CLUB
Received: On time
BROAD PLAIN & RIVERSIDE YOUTH PROJECT
Received: On time