FRIENDS OF IMPERIAL SQUARE HERITAGE AND CONSERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The conservation and enhancement of the public areas of Imperial Square Cheltenham (including Imperial Gardens), including the installation of copies of some of the original features for the benefit and enjoyment of all members of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 05 September 2011: Standard registration
- FISHAC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BOB KEEVIL | Chair | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Kirk Steel | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MAURICE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frank Richard Smith | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER WALSH | Trustee | 31 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.04k | £101 | £37 | £10.00k | £10.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £100.00k | £550 | £20.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/08/2011
Charitable objects
THE CONSERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE PUBLIC AREAS OF IMPERIAL SQUARE, CHELTENHAM (INCLUDING IMPERIAL GARDENS), INCLUDING THE INSTALLATION OF COPIEDS OF SOME OF THE ORIGIONAL FEATURES FOR THE BENEFIT AND ENJOYMENT OF ALL MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 IMPERIAL SQUARE
CHELTENHAM
GL50 1QZ
- Phone:
- 07831 169826
- Email:
- info@fishac.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window