JUBILEE OUTREACH YORKSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and sickness (whether physical or mental), the advancement of education and the preservation and protection of good health among the people of Romania primarily, but also elsewhere in the world. To promote and advance the Christian faith primarily, but also elsewhere in the world. The charity has two shops which help fund the charity's work including funding small projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- North Yorkshire
- Romania
Governance
- 18 October 2011: Standard registration
- 07 May 2013: Funds received from 1004231 JUBILEE OUTREACH YORKSHIRE
- JOY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Armitage | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Henshaw | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BROWN | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr KATHRINE ELIZABETH TEDD M.BCH.B.D | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.85k | £85.71k | £69.59k | £67.78k | £47.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.18k | £68.78k | £85.63k | £68.07k | £58.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 March 2025 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 March 2025 | 323 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/07/2010
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS (WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE PEOPLE OF ROMANIA PRIMARILY, OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 2) THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY TO THE PEOPLE OF ROMANIA OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Langley Road
Bingley
BD16 4AB
- Phone:
- 01274531999
- Email:
- kathy@joyworld.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window