WILLENHALL MEMORIAL HALL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision of memorial hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Walsall
Governance
- 22 July 1971: Standard registration
- 05 March 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- WILLENHALL WAR MEMORIAL HALL APPEAL FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 22 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS (2) THE COMMUNITY CENTRE REPRESENTS A MEMORIAL TO THE MEMORY OF THOSE MEN AND WOMEN OF WILLENHALL WHO GAVE THEIR LIVES FOR FREEDOM IN THE SECOND WORLD WAR 1939-1945
Area of benefit
WILLENHALL AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window