THE WHITE REVIEW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS AND LITERATURE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ARTS AND LITERATURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PUBLICATION OF AN ARTS AND LITERARY JOURNAL AND THE ORGANISATION OF ARTISTIC AND LITERARY EVENTS SPECIALIZING IN ARTISTICALLY OR EDUCATIONALLY MERITORIOUS WORKS OF NEW OR EMERGING ARTISTS AND WRITERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUES TESTARD | Chair | 13 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Wade | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kishani Widyaratna | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ray O'Meara | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rt Hon Tom Morrison-Bell | Trustee | 10 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Eastham | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.18k | £71.49k | £59.92k | £63.00k | £44.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.93k | £70.81k | £88.65k | £57.34k | £36.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £992 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2022
(These accounts |
06 December 2023 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 October 2022 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 October 2022 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 January 2022 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 January 2022 | 160 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS AND LITERATURE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ARTS AND LITERATURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PUBLICATION OF AN ARTS AND LITERARY JOURNAL AND THE ORGANISATION OF ARTISTIC AND LITERARY EVENTS SPECIALIZING IN ARTISTICALLY OR EDUCATIONALLY MERITORIOUS WORKS OF NEW OR EMERGING ARTISTS AND WRITERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
A.103 Fuel Tank
8 - 12 Creekside
London
London
Eng
SE15 4BT
- Phone:
- 0208 065 5324
- Email:
- editors@thewhitereview.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window