Financial history THE DEBT ADVICE NETWORK

Charity number: 1144064
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £163.18k £126.71k £96.04k £136.62k £108.50k
Total expenditure £150.27k £114.33k £91.94k £132.67k £103.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.00k £0 £0