Financial history DERVENTIO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1142979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.39k £40.72k £50.73k £7.80k £43.64k
Total expenditure £34.09k £40.19k £49.95k £7.75k £43.25k
Income from government contracts N/A £34.67k £36.68k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.78k N/A N/A N/A £34.20k