OLD ETONIAN TRUST(THE)

Charity number: 1151597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of education; and the furtherance of charitable objects connected with Eton College.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £378,101
Total expenditure: £47,434

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 April 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • N/A (Working name)
  • THE OLD ETONIAN TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir Nicholas David Coleridge Trustee 24 June 2024
None on record
Peter John McKee Trustee 15 July 2021
THE KYNGE'S COLLEGE OF OUR LADYE OF ETON BESYDE WINDESORE
Received: On time
POOR'S ESTATE
Received: On time
ETON ACTION
Received: On time
Lord Bridges Trustee 31 July 2018
THE CORPUS CHRISTI NICHOLAS BACON FUND
Received: On time
Lord Suffield Trustee 31 July 2018
None on record
Rory Daniel Oswald MacLeay Trustee 11 October 2013
None on record
PIERS ALEXANDER DAVID INKIN Trustee 21 June 2011
None on record
Ashe George Russell Windham Trustee 21 June 2011
LEMPRIERE PRINGLE 2015
Received: On time
THE HENRY VI CHARITY
Received: On time
THE IRISH GUARDS CHARITY
Received: On time
CANCER AND PISCES TRUST
Received: On time
Charles James Robarts Trustee 21 June 2011
THE HENRY VI CHARITY
Received: On time
HERTFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY NURSES CHARITY
Received: On time
RORY BUCHANAN LANDMAN Trustee 21 June 2011
THE PATRICK ROWLAND FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £353.64k £397.48k £331.52k £371.22k £378.10k
Total expenditure £287.16k £843.50k £134.39k £680.00k £47.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Old Vicarage
Great Hormead
Buntingford
Hertfordshire
SG9 0NT
Phone:
01763289413
Website:

No information available