AFRICA WATER ENTERPRISES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local entrepreneurs trained and supported by us to provide safe reliable water in rural Africa. We use our own drilling rig and local staff to install reliable hand-pumps, or multi-taps schemes. We train local people to run the water supply for the village, charging affordable, pre-agreed amounts and banking the surplus to cover all repairs and running costs. Its practical not idealistic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Throughout London
- Kenya
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- The Gambia
- Uganda
Governance
- 06 October 2011: Standard registration
- 29 May 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.41k | £212.74k | £33.23k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.34k | £147.69k | £89.58k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.09k | £165.09k | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 May 2020 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 18 December 2019 | 321 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 25 October 2018 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 25 October 2018 | 267 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/05/2011 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT POVERTY AND TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) REDUCING THE INCIDENCES OF WATER BORNE DISEASES INCLUDING DYSENTERY, GUINEA WORM, DYSENTERY AND DIARRHOEA BY PROVIDING SUSTAINABLE CLEAN DRINKING WATER IN RURAL VILLAGES IN AFRICA WHERE POTABLE SUPPLIES ARE CONTAMINATED OR DIRTY; (B) TRAINING LOCAL WATER MANAGERS TO OPERATE AND MAINTAIN THEIR VILLAGES WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM SUSTAINABLY IN ORDER TO ENSURE THE SYSTEM IS ALWAYS PROVIDING CLEAN WATER, (C) PROVIDING LOW COST BOREHOLE DRILLING SERVICES IN ORDER TO SINK NEW BOREHOLES IN PREVIOUSLY UNSERVED COMMUNITIES AND REPAIRING AND REHABILITATING BROKEN WATER SUPPLY INFRASTRUCTURE INCLUDING TAPS, PIPES, HAND PUMPS, SOLAR PANEL SYSTEMS ETC. (D) PROVIDING ON GOING SUPPORT FOR THE VILLAGE WATER SYSTEM INCLUDING ENHANCING THE LOCAL SUPPLY CHAIN OF SPARE PARTS, PROVIDING TECHNICAL EXPERTISE AND ASSISTING WITH MAJOR REPAIRS WHEN NEEDED; (E) CARRYING OUT MONITORING AND EVALUATION OF THE RURAL WATER SUPPLY SYSTEM TO ENSURE THE SERVICE IS ACCOUNTABLE, TRANSPARENT AND SUSTAINABLE (F) SUPPORTING PROJECTS IN THE ABOVE CATEGORIES 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK IN: (A) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES; (B) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF THE PROVISION OF CLEAN DRINKING WATER, THE HEALTH, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC BENEFITS FOR COMMUNITIES IN AFRICA AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES. IN THIS CLAUSE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS"
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window