Financial history SPRING OF HOPE TRUST

Charity Number: 1143559
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £22.64k £24.65k £28.98k £32.46k £16.81k
Total expenditure £18.65k £27.40k £24.63k £24.13k £9.57k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A