ANIMATE PROJECTS ARTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support artists in the production and distribution of their work, and develop opportunities for the public to engage with artists' work in new ways and contexts. We promote critical debate and discussion, publishing writing about artists' work and related subjects online.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 October 2011: Standard registration
- 01 July 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ANIMATE PROJECTS LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.58k | £15.17k | £106.21k | £71.12k | £34.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.05k | £15.17k | £90.47k | £84.54k | £37.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 March 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 March 2022 | 32 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 80 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 February 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 07 February 2020 | 7 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/03/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/07/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/08/2011 as amended on 15 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE ARTISTIC EXCELLENCE AND EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULARLY THE ARTS AREAS OF ANIMATION, FILM AND DIGITAL MOVING IMAGE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window