NEW DIRECTION FOR CONGO LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Direction for Congo (NDC) is a Cardiff based charity that was established to provide support to Congolese victims of conflict; especially women and children. NDC aims to support marginalised communities in Congo and empower women victims of the long drawn conflict in Congo to find sustainable solutions to daily problems
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cardiff
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 11 October 2011: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NDCONGO (Working name)
- NEW DIRECTION FOR CONGO (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2012 | 08 September 2013 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/08/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO AND THOSE WHO ARE REFUEES LIVING IN THE UK, WHO ARE VICTIMS OF WAR AND TROUBLE IN PARTICLUAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPOT, SERVICES AND TRAINING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window