THE MAELOR MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Present a series of concerts annually
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wrexham
Governance
- 09 March 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Charles Mason | Trustee | 29 July 2012 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM JOHN HUMPHREYS | Trustee | 29 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA MARY ELIZABETH MASON | Trustee | 29 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELIZABETH HUMPHREYS | Trustee | 29 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ELIZABETH PETERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDNA MAY PARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT PATRICK GUY EVERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET BLANCHE BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLIVE ELIZABETH MARY BIRCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rona Williams | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.38k | £0 | £350 | £4.65k | £5.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £250 | £870 | £3.67k | £4.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APRIL 1970 AS AMENDED ON THE 12TH OF MAY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 18 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND FOR THE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE PENLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOUNDARY COTTAGE
WORTHENBURY
WREXHAM
LL13 0AW
- Phone:
- 01948770633
- Email:
- bomar@mulsford.eclipse.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window