WATERLOO ROAD CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church provides a variety of religious and social activities both for its membership and the general public including church services each Sunday at 10.30am and 6.30pm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 20 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY BROWN MA LLM | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samuel George Gillespie | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Marilyn Anne Phipps B.Ed NPQH | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Francis Murphy | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHYLLIS LOVELACE | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Phipps | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mansfield | Trustee | 20 March 2021 |
|
|||||
David Dargue | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER PICKARD | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.20k | £93.55k | £109.46k | £114.51k | £122.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.93k | £80.54k | £105.11k | £112.16k | £428.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 October 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 October 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/09/2004
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH SHALL BE:- 1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN UXBRIDGE, MIDDLESEX AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHRUCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WATERLOO ROAD
UXBRIDGE
MIDDLESEX
UB8 2QX
- Phone:
- 01895257663
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window