TWELVE APOSTLES CHURCH IN UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the statement of belief appearing in the schedule of the Articles of Association. Coffee mornings are conducted to create an environment where people feel confident to discuss, share experiences and problems to find healing, forgiveness and moving on as Jesus Christ did to those who cruxified him.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 June 2018
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Leeds City
- Leicestershire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Sheffield City
- Southend-on-sea
- Throughout London
- Scotland
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 27 October 2011: Standard registration
- TACC-UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ndumiso Mbambo | Trustee | 07 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIBONGINKOSI MKHWANANZI | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOSPHAT MOYO | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH HIKWA CLINICAL LEAD NURSE | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SAZISO MATHE SUPPORT WORKER | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELIAKIM NCUBE | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/06/2014 | 24/06/2015 | 24/06/2016 | 24/06/2017 | 24/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.26k | £13.90k | £19.20k | £17.60k | £15.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.82k | £13.30k | £18.11k | £17.90k | £14.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days | |
Annual return | 24 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 389 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 389 days | |
Annual return | 24 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 755 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 755 days | |
Annual return | 24 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1120 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1120 days | |
Annual return | 24 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1485 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1485 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH HTE STATEMENT OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 21st Avenue
Hull
HU6 8HA
- Phone:
- 01482802049
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window