Financial history PRECIOUS LIVES

Charity number: 1143656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £22.72k £21.88k £29.08k £31.91k £36.82k
Total expenditure £22.59k £20.88k £29.29k £32.27k £36.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.60k £2.50k N/A N/A