Accounts and annual returns BANGOR AND HOLYHEAD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1145002
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 July 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 01 July 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 March 2024 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 March 2024 270 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 August 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 August 2022 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 July 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 July 2020 30 days late Download Open in new window