BANGOR AND HOLYHEAD METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting 5 Methodist Churches which provide religious and community outreach in Penmaenmawr, Llanfairfechan, Bangor, Amlwch and Holyhead.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Conwy
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 10 December 2011: Previously excepted registration
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 September 2014: Re-registered
- BANGOR AND HOLYHEAD ENLISH METHODIST CIRCUIT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Tottle | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Boyce MA | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUE ECKERSLEY | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ADRIENNE LLOYD WRIGHT | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BENJAMIN MOON BSC | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
BERNICE COLLINS | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROYCE MAURICE WARNER | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUE HARDY | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN RICHARD BOYCE MA | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JAMES GILROY | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JOHN ALEXANDER | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MILLIE BARRETT | Trustee | 10 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD JACKSON F.B.C.S. | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MOON | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr JEAN ELIZABETH WARE PGCE, PHD | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELLIE JONES | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOAN MARGARET WARNER | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEAN OWEN | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.39k | £105.00k | £470.28k | £477.68k | £86.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.49k | £121.00k | £470.46k | £462.23k | £96.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 March 2024 | 270 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 March 2024 | 270 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 August 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 August 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 July 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 July 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 01 SEP 1985
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
198 FFORDD PENRHOS
BANGOR
GWYNEDD
LL57 2LX
- Phone:
- 01248353673
- Email:
- MARTYNBOYCE@BTINTERNET.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window