ST ANDREWS LAYHAM CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity raises funds by membership subscriptions and fundraising events open to both members and non members. Funds are then used as match funding for major necessary works and repairs to the fabric of St Andrews Church Layham to ensure the soundness and continuity of the building for future generations to enjoy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 25 August 2011: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS LAYHAM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD WILLIAM LIONEL CRANFIELD | Chair | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANE BARBIAUX | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS LOUISE ALLEN | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr REBECCA GRACE ENGLISH | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40k | £907 | £831 | £1.73k | £3.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27/11/2010
Charitable objects
(A) THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRESSION DETERIMINE AND (B) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS IT IS INTENDED THAT THE SAID INCOME SHALL BE PAID OR APPLIED PRIMARILY TO OR FOR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (I) THE RESTORATION AND REPAIR IMPROVEMENT AND DECORATION OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH AND ADJACENT CHURCHYARD. (II) THE REPAYMENT OF SUMS BORROWED AND APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHURCH. (C) PROVIDED THAT NO PART OF SAID INCOME SHALL UNDER ANY CIRCUMSTANCES BE PAID OR APPLIED OR USED FOR ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT FOR THE TIME BEING LEGALLY CHARITABLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Priory Barn
Lower Raydon
IPSWICH
IP7 5QT
- Phone:
- 01743827812
- Email:
- louise@allenbs.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window