Financial history TORBAY HOLIDAY HELPERS NETWORK (THHN)

Charity Number: 1146245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £69.96k £43.43k £41.96k £45.83k £20.15k
Total expenditure £87.38k £63.40k £64.56k £75.04k £28.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.50k N/A N/A N/A