TORBAY HOLIDAY HELPERS NETWORK (THHN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We believe that everyone deserves quality family time. We are a community of individuals and businesses who donate time and services; uniting together to make a difference. Giving families living with serious illness and bereavement memory making holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Torbay
Governance
- 05 March 2012: Standard registration
- 17 November 2021: Funds received from 1115377 FRIENDS OF OSCAR (OFFERING SUPPORT TO CHILDREN AND...
- THHN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN ROBERT BROOK | Chair | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Helen Duffield | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Bunce | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.96k | £43.43k | £41.96k | £45.83k | £20.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.38k | £63.40k | £64.56k | £75.04k | £28.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND RESPITE FOR FAMILIES WHO A) HAVE A SERIOUSLY ILL (LIFE THREATENING/LIFE LIMITING) OR TERMINALLY ILL CHILD B) HAVE LOST A CHILD C) HAVE A TERMINALLY ILL PARENT OR LOST A PARENT BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FREE OR SUBSIDISED HOLIDAYS. THE CHILD AND THEIR FAMILIES MUST RESIDE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TO BENEFIT FROM THE HOLIDAYS WHICH COULD BE LOCATED WORLDWIDE. IN THIS CLAUSE “CHILD” MAY INCLUDE A YOUNG ADULT AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUPP & FRASER
7 ST. PAULS ROAD
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 2HP
- Phone:
- 01803900101
- Email:
- enquiries@thhn.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window