HORN OF AFRICA ASSOCIATION FOR EDUCATION, HEALTH & DEVELOPMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
Governance
- 27 June 2011: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/06/2011
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED, PEOPLE WITH IMPAIRED MOVEMENT, VISION OR HEARING, AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, SUCH AS COMMUNITY LEARNING PROGRAMMES, TUITION CLASSES, SCHOLARSHIPS AND THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES AND TRAINING CENTRES; (II) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE POOR, UNDERPRIVILEGED AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT, CLINICS, MEDICINES OR GRANTS FOR MEDICAL DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, AND PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION; (III) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS, ORPHANS, REFUGEES, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER, CLOTHING, MEDICAL TREATMENT, REHABILITATION, AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS; (IV) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES, AND THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION, SUCH THAT SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS; (V)TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE IN NEED THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window