Financial history SRI LANKAN MUSLIM FOUNDATION CRAWLEY

Charity Number: 1144111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.42k £54.96k £35.80k £45.35k £45.34k
Total expenditure £34.19k £39.14k £30.29k £43.97k £43.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A