KEEPTHEBEAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Hope and Support to those affected by Congenital Heart Defects, & Heart Transplantation throughout the United Kingdom
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 July 2011: Standard registration
- 21 March 2022: Funds received from 1115950 THE COURTNEY SCARLETT MEMORIAL FUND
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNITA AMY Tansey | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ADAM JOHN TANSEY | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL TANSEY BSC HONS. | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.41k | £25.09k | £32.81k | £50.86k | £9.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.36k | £27.27k | £17.62k | £21.61k | £34.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF AND SUPPORT FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS) AFFECTED BY CONGENITAL HEART DEFECTS; AND 2.TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ON THE SUBJECT OF CONGENITAL HEART DEFECTS AND THE EFFECTS ON CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 10204
HINCKLEY
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE10 9EX
- Phone:
- 0116 318 3960
- Email:
- info@KEEPTHEBEAT.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window