HELP RURAL NEPAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help Rural Nepal raises funds in the UK to support health and education projects. Our main focus has been in the remote area of Dhading district, west of Kathmandu. We have assisted several schools by providing books, computers, solar panels, volunteer and permanent teaching staff. Our health programme supports individual cases, health camps, and providing medical equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Nepal
Governance
- 26 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE MARY WYSE MBA | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY HAZELL | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAM RAFFETY | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.95k | £8.55k | £4.53k | £9.31k | £9.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.55k | £1.43k | £19.14k | £8.62k | £7.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN NEPAL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE KHARARE AREA OF NEPAL BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH; AND (C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS AND SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 OLD SCHOOL LANE
CLIFTON
BRISTOL
BS8 4TY
- Phone:
- +447912621804
- Email:
- INFO@HELPRURALNEPAL.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window