Trustees THE BARRACKS TRUST
Charity Number: 1142950

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY ERIC GREEN | Chair | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Anne Smith | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Eric Platt | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
RENE CARLISLE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Reddish | Trustee | 31 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RILEY | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Peter Austin Davis | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.