YOUTH TOGETHER FOR HUMAN RIGHTS EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aims are to bring Human Rights to all in Pakistan, eliminate all forms of discrimination, encourage equal opportunity, promote equal rights for women and religious/cultural harmony. We deliver seminars, workshops and conferences on Human Rights.We conduct Peace Walks and train volunteers. In the UK we raise awareness of human rights issues that hinder global peace and require UN/UK support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Pakistan
Governance
- 05 September 2011: Standard registration
- YTHRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE BULLOCK | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
FAREEDA BULBROOK | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN BULLOCK | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR J WILSON | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DALE BULBROOK | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.39k | £112.77k | £11.90k | £1.10k | £708 | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.35k | £111.87k | £11.69k | £1.10k | £211 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 26/08/2011
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; B. RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; C. EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; D. COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; E. RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; F. PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; G. PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS BY INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; H. INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; I. ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. 2.SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hafod Oleu
Waunfawr
Caernarfon
LL55 4EX
- Phone:
- 07941204006
- Email:
- info@ythre.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window