DEVON FAITH AND BELIEF FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO DEVELOP INVOLVEMENT OF FAITH AND BELIEF GROUPS WITH SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL, ENVIRONMENTAL AND ECONOMIC LIFE IN DEVON TO ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION OF FAITH AND BELIEF GROUPS IN PARTNERSHIPS AND CIVIC LIFE TO ENABLE DIALOGUE BETWEEN FAITH AND BELIEF COMMUNITIES AND PUBIC AND VOLUNTARY SECTORS TO DEVELOP COMMUNITY PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 05 September 2012: Standard registration
- DFBF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Billie Snowden | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Judith Joanna Taylorson | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Edward Becher | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicola Dawn Gibson | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Warren Houghton | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ravindra Nathwani | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marc Frank | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edward Francis Pawson | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ramona Margaret Jo-Anne Nash | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Anne Hannan | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.46k | £4.25k | £4.50k | £4.50k | £4.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.56k | £1.60k | £1.58k | £3.46k | £4.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/07/2012 as amended on 13 Jun 2019 as amended on 28 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIONS AND BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS AND BELIEFS. PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITH AND BELIEF GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mint Methodist Church Centre
Fore Street
EXETER
EX4 3AT
- Phone:
- 07737852964
- Email:
- dfbfsecretary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window