THE MINEHEAD HOPE CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO SHOW THE LOVE AND COMPASSION OF JESUS CHRIST TO ALL THOSE WITH WHOM IT COMES INTO CONTACT: - RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE IN MINEHEAD AND WEST SOMERSET WHO SUFFER FROM DRUG AND/OR ALCOHOL ABUSE OR HOMELESSNESS AND THE CONSEQUENCES OF SUCH. - PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION BY RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 12 September 2011: Standard registration
- THC TRUST (Working name)
- THE HOPE CENTRE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elinor Mary Nicholas | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Munsey | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Christopher McCabe | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Ian Victor McLaren | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ann Horsfield | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.16k | £22.69k | £12.01k | £21.46k | £40.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.85k | £23.97k | £27.74k | £27.49k | £21.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11/09/2011 as amended on 17 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE IN MINEHEAD AND WEST SOMERSET WHO SUFFER FROM DRUG AND/OR ALCOHOL ABUSE OR HOMELESSNESS AND THOSE WHO SUFFER THE CONSEQUENCES OF DRUG AND/OR ALCOHOL ABUSE OR HOMELESSNESS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. 2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Minehead Baptist Church
4 The Parks
MINEHEAD
TA24 8BS
- Phone:
- 07949 642774
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window