Trustees FULL CIRCLE DOCKLANDS LTD

Charity number: 1143529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Guy Walker Chair 20 March 2023
None on record
Dr Shawn Sobers Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Jon Mowat Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Emily Catherine Cook Trustee 17 June 2024
None on record
Bianca Saad Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Nicola Diane Osborne Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
JUDITH DAVIS Trustee 07 February 2012
None on record
Dr JONATHAN ROGERS Trustee 24 August 2011
None on record
MARION HARRIS Trustee 02 August 2011
None on record