THE STUDENTS' UNION AT BOURNEMOUTH UNIVERSITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education of students at Bournemouth University for the public benefit by: Promoting the interests and welfare of students at Bournemouth University during their course of study and representing, supporting and advising students; Providing social, cultural, sporting and recreational activities and forums for disucssions and debate for the personal development of its students
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 December 2011: Standard registration
- 16 March 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 16 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1189548 THE STUDENTS' UNION AT BU LTD
- SUBU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.16m | £5.23m | £5.34m | £4.31m | £130.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.93m | £5.17m | £5.49m | £4.35m | £182.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.84m | £1.83m | £1.89m | £2.17m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.59m | £1.67m | £1.76m | £967.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.73m | £1.73m | £1.69m | £1.18m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.54k | £1.08k | £2.50k | £1.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £1.89m | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.40m | £3.56m | £3.78m | £3.28m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.52m | £1.61m | £1.70m | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £83.80k | £45.07k | £12.30k | £47.01k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.08m | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE UNION'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT BOURNEMOUTH UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT BOURNEMOUTH UNIVERSITY DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND BOURNEMOUTH UNIVERSITY AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window