THE JACK AND ADA BEATTIE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fighting Corners: Knowing that someone is fighting your corner is half the battle won. The Jack And Ada Beattie Foundation-concerned with supporting victims of social or physical injustice. The Foundation assists the vulnerable and marginalised in Birmingham+London. We're interested in fighting someone's corner. Helping those who have been abandoned and slipped through the net of Government help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ANTHONY BEATTIE | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR STEPHEN BEATTIE | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER ROBERT BEATTIE | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.44k | £18.07k | £47.52k | £15.73k | £14.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.69k | £12.95k | £50.52k | £20.06k | £14.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO AGE, SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES AND THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL JUSTICE IN SUCH PARTS OF LONDON, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Soho Works
Unit 4.07
The Tea Building
56 Shoredtich High Street
London
E1 6JJ
- Phone:
- 0000000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window