Governing document THE MORINGA TREE LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/07/2011
Charitable objects
4. THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING (IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT): (A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (C)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, HERITAGE AND CULTURE IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF INDIGENOUS MUSIC AND CULTURE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN COLLABORATION WITH LOCAL COMMUNITIES; (D)THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; (E)THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING; (F)THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING; AND (G)SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (THAT FALL WITHIN THE DESCRIPTIONS OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES SET OUT IN PART 1 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2006) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.