THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MARTON-IN-CLEVELAND WITH EASTERSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anglican Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Middlesbrough
Governance
- 04 July 2011: Standard registration
- PCC ST CUTHBERT'S CHURCH, MARTON (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT'S CHURCH, MARTON, MIDDLESBROUGH (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN RAYMOND PROUDLER | Chair | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samuel Michael Tyndall | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Lund | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Christine Jennifer Binnie | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Caroline Mary Taylor | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Anthony Neal | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Anne Paylor | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS PETER FORD | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Ann Pybus | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Freda Ford | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Eleanor Lythe | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Neal | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GORDON LESLIE MALLORY | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|||||
LINDA MARIE PROUDLER | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA SWAN | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.87k | £114.27k | £105.83k | £116.41k | £122.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.68k | £82.81k | £99.84k | £139.27k | £140.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Bramble Close
Stainton
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS8 9FE
- Phone:
- 01642975419
- Email:
- ask@stcuthbertmarton.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window