SESKU ACADEMY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SESKU Academy offers Alternative Education, for young people who have been permanently excluded from mainstream college. Employment/training opportunities to unemployed people living in deprived neighbourhoods by supporting routes into education training and employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 05 August 2011: Standard registration
- 14 November 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 November 2023: Funds transferred to 1166340 INVOLVE LEEDS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.96k | £125.17k | £201.91k | £212.77k | £45.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.03k | £138.64k | £188.64k | £178.85k | £112.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £102.00k | £104.59k | £166.37k | £212.77k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £29.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR THROUGH (A) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window