DORCAN CHURCH SWINDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dorcan Church engages in a range of activities including the celebration of public worship, the teaching of the Christian faith, Mission and evangelism, Pastoral work,the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community and the support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Swindon
- Uganda
Governance
- 07 September 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Trudie Anne Wigley | Chair | 14 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Diane Killick | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Stephen Roe | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Joanne Broom | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLARE ROSE | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Alice Prichard | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Smith | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH MORGANS | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicki Clinch | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY PRICHARD | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR CHRIS ROSE | Trustee | 21 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER SHIRLEY POOLE | Trustee | 06 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
NATHALIE CATHERINE MARSHALL | Trustee | 06 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER MULCOCK | Trustee | 06 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev STUART FREDERICK FISHER | Trustee | 06 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.83k | £133.60k | £133.42k | £135.60k | £179.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.85k | £128.83k | £133.31k | £136.98k | £167.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.75k | £20.87k | £2.95k | £1.11k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CHARITY WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): A)THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; B)THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; C)MISSION AND EVANGELISM; D)PASTORAL WORK, INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK AND THE BEREAVED; E)THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE ELDERLY, THE YOUNG AND OTHER GROUPS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; F)THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Pauls Church Centre
St. Pauls Drive
SWINDON
SN3 5BY
- Phone:
- 01793435987
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window