FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S NETHERBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of St Mary's, Netherbury is an organisation formed to raise funds for the care and renovation of the fabric of the church building and its grounds. All monies raised by the Friends are held in a secure fund reserved solely for the care of the fabric of the church building and its grounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 25 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giulietta Horner | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Morag Helen Simpson Curtis | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MILES | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
GLENN YORKE SPENCE BISHOP | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.94k | £4.72k | £5.00k | £3.92k | £4.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.18k | £1.18k | £2.59k | £1.30k | £3.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY, NETHERBURY (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS ST MARY'S) IN PARTICULAR BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, IMPROVEMENTS, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE FABRIC OF THE BUILDINGS, ITS MONUMENTS, GROUNDS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, ORGAN, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elwell Lodge
Waytown
Bridport
DT6 5LF
- Phone:
- 01308488764
- Email:
- gys.ca.bishop@gmail.com
- Website:
-
None
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window