Financial history STRATFORD UPON AVON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 502020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £21.00k £2.37k £21.35k £34.30k £32.59k
Total expenditure £20.13k £842 £18.05k £28.17k £29.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A