THREE CHEERS FOR CHEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Epsom based charity raising funds through donations, coffee mornings, book sales, tombolas at fairs, and similar activites
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 December 2011: Standard registration
- NONE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowena Greogory | Chair | 28 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
John Penfold | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Donald Bull | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Elizabeth Willis | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.68k | £229 | £231 | £300 | £345 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.07k | £20 | £605 | £700 | £684 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/11/2011
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE WHO HAVE BEEN PATIENTS AT THE EPSOM AND ST HELIER HOSPITAL TRUST AND THE ROYAL MARSDEN HOSPITAL BY THE PROVISION OF DISCHARGE HAMPERS TO ASSIST IN THEIR RECUPERATION. 2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Bramble Walk
Epsom
KT18 7TB
- Phone:
- 01372209702
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window