JOHN BOWLEY AND SHERWOOD ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 1143234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity provides low cost housing for retired people with a low income that live in Folkestone.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £113,826
Total expenditure: £108,849

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THOMAS MCNEICE Chair 09 November 2011
FOLKESTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Mary Lawes Trustee 17 November 2022
FOLKESTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Stephen Ind Trustee 17 February 2022
FOLKESTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Jennifer Todd Trustee 14 October 2021
FOLKESTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
David Burton Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Rebecca Shoob Trustee 20 January 2021
FOLKESTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Paul Bingham Cllr Trustee 02 May 2019
FOLKESTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Neil Jones Trustee 11 May 2018
FOLKESTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Richard Wallace Trustee 15 May 2015
None on record
COUNCILLOR Roger West Trustee 18 September 2014
FOLKESTONE MUNICIPAL CHARITY
Received: On time
FOLKESTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ROSEMARY IRENE BRAID Trustee 09 November 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £96.42k £102.30k £99.90k £106.66k £113.83k
Total expenditure £57.73k £63.53k £67.79k £82.81k £108.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 14/03/2007
Charitable objects
1A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS RESIDING OR HAVING IMMEDIATE FAMILY RESIDING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. THOSE PERSONS IN NEED MAY BE INDIVIDUALS OF EITHER SEX, OR A COUPLE WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION TOWARDS CIVIL PARTNERSHIPS. B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
FOLKESTONE
Registration history
  • 19 November 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
MAGEE GAMMON
HENWOOD HOUSE
HENWOD
ASHFORD
TN24 8DH
Phone:
07970815293