OLDBURY REPERTORY PLAYERS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur theatre group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
93 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sandwell
Governance
- 05 December 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Morgan-Salcombe | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tim Ward | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Walker | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Guest | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Payne | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Clayton | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra May Bird | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVID WORLEY | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN DAVID THOMPSON | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Grant | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SALLY WORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER ALAN TURTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.67k | £135.29k | £89.54k | £69.15k | £97.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.99k | £68.98k | £43.83k | £88.72k | £87.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.92k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH FEBRUARY, 1947.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Barlow Theatre
3 Spring Walk
OLDBURY
B69 4SP
- Phone:
- 01384253438
- Email:
- info@oldburyrep.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window