Beyond Detention

Charity number: 1143160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We visit those held in Yarl's Wood IRC aiming to affirm human dignity and restore self-esteem by listening and offering befriending support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £213,209
Total expenditure: £311,110

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • Beyond Detention (Working name)
  • YWB (Working name)
  • YARL'S WOOD BEFRIENDERS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wozani Chida Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
KINGA SIMONY Trustee 14 September 2023
None on record
Eleanor Hitchman Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
Catherine Kirk Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
Kristen Hope Burchill Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
Jivan Dempsey Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Stella Maureen Shyanguya Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Robina Pelham Burn Trustee 08 October 2019
THE CHILDREN'S BOOKSHOW
Received: On time
Sarah Grahame Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £148.37k £193.73k £163.37k £346.91k £213.21k
Total expenditure £154.25k £134.12k £189.90k £267.90k £311.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE RELIEF OF IMMIGRANTS AND REFUGEES WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR ARE IN NEED, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE, BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO THOSE WHO ARE IMPRISONED OR DETAINED BY THE IMMIGRATION SERVICES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM WHETHER IN HOLDING CENTRES, PRISON OR POLICE STATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 26 September 2005 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
C V S Mid & North Beds
43 Bromham Road
BEDFORD
MK40 2AA
Phone:
01234867219