THE BIG HEART CHARITY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote and protect the physical and mental health of sufferes from heart related conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 May 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 August 2011: Standard registration
- 03 April 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/05/2020 | 10/05/2021 | 10/05/2022 | 10/05/2023 | 10/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20 | £3 | £10.00k | £51 | £287 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.59k | £1.46k | £30 | £4.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 May 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 May 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 May 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 May 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 May 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23/06/2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF HEART RELATED CONDITIONS IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND WELFARE (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO THE HEART
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window