HELP IN EGYPT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HELP IN EGYPT provides aid to poor families in a number of villages near in Upper Egypt. Supplying food,blankets,first aid. Assisting with hospital treatment and eye examinations. Medical care for young Mothers and their babies plus connecting fresh water pipes to homes and constructing toilets,shower rooms and in some cases kitchens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Egypt
Governance
- 16 August 2011: Standard registration
- 07 October 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NO (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2012 | 30/08/2013 | 30/08/2014 | 30/08/2015 | 30/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.10k | £13.03k | £6.00k | £9.64k | £8.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.16k | £12.96k | £5.88k | £9.59k | £8.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2016 | 14 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2015 | 19 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2014 | 04 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/08/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN EGYPT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN BESHLAW, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT AND EQUIPMENT. 2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN EGYPT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN BESHLAW. 3) THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN EGYPT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN BESHLAW.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window