Financial history NORTHWOOD AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1144907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £63.78k £36.90k £44.21k £75.08k £73.96k
Total expenditure £60.41k £29.35k £46.59k £78.96k £75.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A