CHANGING HORIZONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Changing Horizons is a dedicated mental health charity committed to creating a healthier, more inclusive society. We provide a number of mental health courses create to give people the knowledge and confidence to support someone in crisis. We are also committed to tackling the stigma and discrimination around mental health and mental illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 March 2012: Standard registration
- CHANGE THROUGH CHALLENGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN O'CONNOR | Chair | 02 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN HARVEY | Trustee | 28 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
NEIL ROBERTSON | Trustee | 10 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/10/2019 | 28/10/2020 | 28/10/2021 | 28/10/2022 | 28/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.75k | £1.00k | £0 | £24.17k | £13.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.83k | £11.20k | £0 | £23.37k | £10.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 October 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 October 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 October 2021 | 13 April 2023 | 228 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 October 2019 | 04 April 2022 | 584 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN DORSET OR FURTHER AFIELD, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 2. THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PLACEMENT OF VOLUNTEERS TO UNDERTAKE SUCH PURPOSES
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Oak Way
WEYMOUTH
DT3 6JJ
- Phone:
- 07888897288
- Email:
- stuartskinner@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window