THE VALECHA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity will be making grants to other Charities and educational organisations in furthurance of its objctives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KUMUDINI VALECHA | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEEP VALECHA | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £50.00k | £0 | £50.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.30k | £15.00k | £8.46k | £14.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 June 2021 | 374 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/07/2011
Charitable objects
1) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT, PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD. 3) PROVIDING RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE TO VICTIMS OF WAR, NATURAL DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Regent Gas
Regent House
Kendal Avenue
LONDON
W3 0XA
- Phone:
- 02088966000
- Email:
- info@tvcf.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window