PENGE ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Islamic centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
Governance
- 09 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IRSHAD GAFFAR | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
FARHAAN GAFFAR | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
IFRAAN GAFFAR | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.29k | £17.57k | £18.97k | £28.24k | £26.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.99k | £13.69k | £22.57k | £21.96k | £30.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 JUL 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY ARE: (A) THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY ARE TO CONTROL THE RUNNING OF THE MOSQUE LOCATED AT 157A HIGH STREET, PENGE, LONDON AND IN PURSUANCE THEREOF: (B) TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM FAITH AND MEET THE SPIRITUAL NEEDS OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE SCRIPTURES, TO PROMOTE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND ADHERENCE TO THE MUSLIM RELIGION AND PARTICIPATION IN WORSHIP AND PRAYER AND THE MUSLIM WAY OF LIFE. THESE ARE ITS CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE 2006 ACT. FOR AS LONG AS THE COMPANY IS A CHARITY, ITS PURPOSES MAY ONLY BE ALTERED WITH THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY CONDITIONS ATTACHED TO SUCH CONSENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 LEIGHAM COURT ROAD
LONDON
SW16 2NJ
- Phone:
- 07808158704
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window