Financial history JESUS THE VOICE OF HOPE GLOBAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1143442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £74.06k £36.31k £51.33k £29.16k £28.62k
Total expenditure £77.61k £31.56k £49.91k £33.07k £31.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.15k N/A N/A N/A