FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith by supporting the churches of the Denomination of the Free Church of England in worship and witness; by planting new churches; and by activities supportive of these aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

37 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 July 2011: Standard registration
- FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RIGHT REVD DR JOHN ROBERT KIPLING FENWICK DD | Chair | 07 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Terrence William Brighton | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew Ormond | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Samuel Benett-King | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev David Paul Binder | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Ambrose Oliver | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Snaddon | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Stephen Taylor | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Eric Peter Fenwick | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Matthew Spiers | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Matthew Paul Firth MA BTh | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Stephen William Lawson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Valerie Elizabeth Brighton | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Christina Bishop | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Jordan Bishop | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Grace Choe | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Daniel Choe | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Margaret Mills | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Mark Nicholas Gretason | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Henry Birtley | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Julieann Rothwell | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Elizabeth Claire Garratt | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Anthony Gerard Ford MBE | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Dawn McDonald | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Joy Tamileniyal Sahadevan | Trustee | 11 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Jabson Watson | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
LESLEY SECKER | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||
THANGARAJ TONY VEDAMUTHU | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||
MR BILL CLEMENTS | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Rev ROBERT ARTHUR WILSON | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
RIGHT REVD PAUL NIGEL HUNT BSC, MSC | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
NATALIE EMMA STENSTROM BSC | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
MARLENE PARKER | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
NORMA CLARKSON BED PGCE | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Rev MARK ANDREW SPIERS | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
MATTHEW FOGG | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
|||||||||
COLIN CHRISTOPHER MILLS | Trustee | 07 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.11k | £33.41k | £28.64k | £29.50k | £27.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.19k | £24.67k | £24.84k | £35.67k | £28.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 November 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/05/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNION WITH AND ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OTHERWISE CALLED THE REFORMED EPISCOPAL CHURCH CONTAINED WITHIN THE DECLARATION OF PRINCIPLES AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1.
Contact information
- Address:
-
329 Wolverhampton Road West
Willenhall
WV13 2RL
- Phone:
- 01902607335
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window